CA AJR1 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-29 - Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 2629.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Donnelly. Reconsideration granted. (Page 2629.) Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2653.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to undocumented criminals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Undocumented criminals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-29 - Assembly - AJR1 DONNELLY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 49) [FAIL]
2011-08-29 - Assembly - AJR1 DONNELLY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [FAIL]
2011-07-13 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-29 Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 2629.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Donnelly. Reconsideration granted. (Page 2629.) Read. Refused adoption. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2653.)
2011-08-25 Amended. (Page 2570.)
2011-07-14 Amended. Ordered to third reading.
2011-07-13 From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2011-04-06 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2011-03-15 From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-02-10 Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2011-01-20 From printer.
2011-01-19 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ajr_1&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20110119_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20110714_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20110825_amended_asm_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20110315_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20110713_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20110829_0311PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20110829_1238PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback