CA ACR98 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-16)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to mental health and substance use treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health and substance use treatment.

Sponsors

Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Sen. Jim Beall [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Sen. Connie Leyva [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 98 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-09SenateIn committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
2019-09-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-08-27SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-08-26AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2842.)
2019-08-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2019-08-14AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-05AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-06-04AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback