CA ACR87 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-18)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-04 - Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to civic education in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Upholding democracy through civic education in public schools.

Sponsors

Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Amend, and be adopted as amended and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-08-27SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-08-26AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2840.)
2019-08-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-06-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-24AssemblyAmended.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2019-05-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-03AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-05-02AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback