CA ACR83 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-19)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Missing and Murdered Indigenous Women and Girls Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Missing and Murdered Indigenous Women and Girls Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent ACR83 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2019.
2019-05-31AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-05-23SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1282.)
2019-05-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-15SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-07SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-05-06AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1521.)
2019-05-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-04-30AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback