CA ACR81 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-15)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Fishing and Boating Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Fishing and Boating Week.

Sponsors

Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR81 Gipson et al. By McGuire (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2019-06-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-06-10SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1474.)
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-04SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-06-03AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2174.)
2019-06-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2019-05-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-30AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-04-29AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback