CA ACR78 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public utilities.
Title
Public utilities: Pacific Gas and Electric Company: bankruptcy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR78 Holden et al. By Hill (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - ACR 78 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - ACR 78 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2444.) |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1638.) |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |