CA ACR77 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-24)
Status: Engrossed on August 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental centers.

Sponsors

Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Sen. Scott Wilk [R]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-07-11 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-28SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-08-24AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2767.)
2017-08-24AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-20AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-07-20AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-07-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-17AssemblyAmended.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-06-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-04-26AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback