CA ACR73 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-19-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Autism Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autism Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR73 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 41, Statutes of 2021.
2021-05-21 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2021-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-05-17SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2021-05-17SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-05-05SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-27SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-04-26AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-04-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22).
2021-04-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-04-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback