CA ACR71 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-19)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Provider Appreciation Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provider Appreciation Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent ACR71 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - ACR 71 Villapudua Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2021.
2021-06-11 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-06-01SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
2021-05-28SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-05-19SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-10SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-05-06AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.)
2021-05-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2021-04-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-04-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback