CA ACR69 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to “Parks Make Life Better!” Month.
Title
“Parks Make Life Better!” Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Special Consent ACR69 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - ACR 69 Eduardo Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - ACR 69 Eduardo Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1450.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1774.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |