CA ACR65 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California’s Day of Dance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California’s Day of Dance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Special Consent ACR65 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - ACR 65 Weber Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-25AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2019-06-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-06-20SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1679.)
2019-06-17SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-05-29AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2129.)
2019-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2019-05-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-04-02AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback