CA ACR64 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-20-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Harvey L. Hall Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harvey L. Hall Memorial Highway.

Sponsors

Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Sen. Shannon Grove [R]Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D]
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]
Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - ACR 64 Fong Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent ACR64 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - ACR 64 Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-08-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.)
2021-08-19SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-16SenateOrdered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-05-05SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-27SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-04-26AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1184.)
2021-04-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-22AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 19).
2021-04-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-04-06AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-04-05AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback