CA ACR64 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-5)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California State University and University of California: SAT and ACT.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR64 McCarty et al. By Glazer (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-09-05SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 2576.)
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-10SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-06-06AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2220.)
2019-06-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-04-02AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback