CA ACR63 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-18-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.

Sponsors

Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]
Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent ACR63 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2021.
2021-05-03 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2021-04-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-04-29SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.)
2021-04-27SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-04-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-13SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-04-12AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-04-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
2021-04-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-04-06AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-04-05AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback