CA ACR62 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-16)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Nonprofits Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Nonprofits Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Sen. Holly Mitchell [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Special Consent ACR62 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-25AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2019-06-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-06-20SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1679.)
2019-06-17SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-04SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-06-03AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2172.)
2019-06-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2019-04-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-29AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-03-28AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback