CA ACR60 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Larry Stanley Pierce Memorial Highway.
Title
The Medal of Honor Recipient Larry Stanley Pierce
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-06 - Assembly - ACR 60 GILMORE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 ACR60 Gilmore (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - ACR 60 GILMORE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 ACR60 Gilmore (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - ACR 60 GILMORE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-07-13 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:40 p.m. | |
2009-07-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2387.) | |
2009-06-29 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2009-06-29 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1521.) | |
2009-06-25 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-11 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-10 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2009-05-21 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-14 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1467.) | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-04-14 | From printer. | |
2009-04-13 | Introduced. To print. |