CA ACR59 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to autism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autism: sensory-friendly movie screenings.

Sponsors

Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR59 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-20AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
2019-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-06-17SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.)
2019-06-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2019-05-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-04-29SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-04-25AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1354.)
2019-04-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22).
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-03-25AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback