CA ACR59 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to autism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autism: sensory-friendly movie screenings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR59 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-20AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
2019-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-06-17SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.)
2019-06-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2019-05-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-04-29SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-04-25AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1354.)
2019-04-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22).
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-03-25AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback