CA ACR58 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-16-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Valley Fever Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Valley Fever Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Sen. Shannon Grove [R]Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D]
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR58 Fong et al. By Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Assembly - ACR 58 Fong Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-09-02AssemblyAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
2021-08-25SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-07-15AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-07-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8).
2021-04-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-03-24AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback