CA ACR58 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Special Olympics Day.
Title
Special Olympics Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent ACR58 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1006.) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1071.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |