CA ACR57 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-22)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the American Legion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Legion.

Sponsors

Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Sen. Patricia Bates [R]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Sen. Tom Umberg [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Sen. Scott Wilk [R]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent ACR57 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-23AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-23AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2019-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-11SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.)
2019-07-03SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-18SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-06-17AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 2297.)
2019-06-17AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2019-04-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-03-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback