CA ACR56 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-18)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Limb Loss Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limb Loss Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent ACR56 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2019.
2019-05-15AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-05-09SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1006.)
2019-05-06SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-05-01SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-23SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-04-22AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 1252.)
2019-04-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-03-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback