CA ACR56 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-25 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-25 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to tribal gaming compact ratification.
Title
Tribal gaming: local support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-16 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-08-18 | From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-14 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Pavley. | |
2009-05-06 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |
2009-04-21 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-20 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 985.) | |
2009-04-16 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |
2009-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |
2009-04-02 | From printer. Referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-04-01 | Introduced. To print. |