CA ACR54 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-19)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-19)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Wines: Down to Earth Month.
Title
California Wines: Down to Earth Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR54 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-05-07 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1009.) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1068.) |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |