CA ACR53 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Purple Star Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purple Star School Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar ACR53 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - ACR 53 Ward Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2021.
2021-07-01 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2021-06-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-06-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-09SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-05SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-04-27SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-04-26AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1189.)
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-03-29AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2021-03-23AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-03-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback