CA ACR53 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Down syndrome awareness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Down Syndrome Awareness Week and Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Special Consent ACR53 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2019.
2019-04-29AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2019-04-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-04-22SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 747.)
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-26SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-03-25AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 814.)
2019-03-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21).
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-03-18AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback