CA ACR48 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to American Red Cross Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Red Cross Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Special Consent ACR48 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - ACR 48 Rodriguez Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2021.
2021-05-03 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2021-04-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-04-29SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.)
2021-04-27SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-04-14SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-03-25SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-03-25AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-03-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 18).
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-17AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-03-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback