CA ACR38 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to American Red Cross Month.
Title
American Red Cross Month.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |