CA ACR30 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to COVID-19 Victims and Survivors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 Victims and Survivors Memorial Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]
Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Special Consent ACR30 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2021.
2021-04-07 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2021-03-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-03-25SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.)
2021-03-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-03-02SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-03-01AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-03-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 25).
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-02-17AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback