CA ACR28 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-17)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to National Caregivers Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Caregivers Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Special Consent ACR28 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Assembly - ACR 28 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2021.
2021-04-07 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2021-03-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-03-25SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.)
2021-03-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-03-03SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-22SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-02-18AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 365.)
2021-02-18AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 12).
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-11AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-02-10AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback