CA ACR268 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 221, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 221, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to education technology.
Title
Education technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR268 Thurmond et al. By Hill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - ACR 268 THURMOND Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - ACR 268 THURMOND Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 221, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 6165.) |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to third reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 (August 30). |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6911.) |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6560.) |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-07-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |