CA ACR261 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Hindu American Awareness and Appreciation Month.
Title
California Hindu American Awareness and Appreciation Month.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR261 Kalra et al. By Delgado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 219, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6123.) |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6706.) |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |