CA ACR259 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-22)
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome (PANS) Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome (PANS) Awareness Day.

Sponsors

Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent ACR259 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-30AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-30AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-24SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5705.)
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-15SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-14SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-13AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 6247.)
2018-08-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2018-06-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-06-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback