CA ACR252 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-23)
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 4th of July.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The 4th of July.

Sponsors

Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent ACR252 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-30AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-30AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-24SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-08SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-07-02AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 6061.)
2018-07-02AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-06-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback