CA ACR252 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 4th of July.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The 4th of July.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-06-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback