CA ACR250 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Arroyo Seco Victims Memorial Overcrossing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arroyo Seco Victims Memorial Overcrossing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - ACR 250 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR250 Holden By Portantino (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - ACR 250 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-07AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-09SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-08-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-06-28SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-06-28AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6033.)
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-06-08AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-06-07AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback