CA ACR25 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-21-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Áo Dài Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Áo Dài Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Sen. Patricia Bates [R]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R]
Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent ACR25 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - ACR 25 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2021.
2021-06-11 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-06-01SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
2021-05-28SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-05-26SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-17SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-05-13AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.)
2021-05-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2021-05-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-09AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-02-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback