CA ACR247 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1-1)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - In committee: Refused adoption.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - In committee: Refused adoption.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 40th anniversary of Proposition 13.
Title
40th anniversary of Proposition 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Assembly | In committee: Refused adoption. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |