CA ACR246 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-10-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to World Oceans Day.
Title
World Oceans Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR246 Calderon et al. By Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5105.) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5726.) |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |