CA ACR246 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-12)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to World Oceans Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

World Oceans Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR246 Calderon et al. By Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-05SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-11SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-06-07AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 5726.)
2018-06-07AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4).
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-01AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-05-31AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback