CA ACR234 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 200, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Breastfeeding Awareness Month of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Breastfeeding Awareness Month of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - ACR 234 RUBIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR234 Rubio et al. By Mitchell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Assembly - ACR 234 RUBIO Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 200, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6872.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-27SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5807.)
2018-08-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2018-08-13SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-13AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6257.)
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-04AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-05-03AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback