CA ACR219 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Second Chances Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Second Chances Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR219 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Skinner (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-26AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2018-06-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-21SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4825.)
2018-05-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-05-10AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 5127.)
2018-05-10AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-04-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-13AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-04-12AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback