CA ACR217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Point Reyes National Seashore.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Point Reyes National Seashore: dairy and beef ranching.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent ACR217 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Assembly - ACR 217 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-30AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-30AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-24SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5704.)
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-08SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-07-05AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6107.)
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-04-09AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback