CA ACR213 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-8-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-09 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-09 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California HPV Vaccine Week.
Title
California HPV Vaccine Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-09 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.) |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-08-02 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |