CA ACR197 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children: from at-risk to at-promise.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-05-10AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 5126.)
2018-05-10AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-09AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-03-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback