CA ACR195 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Adopted and to Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Relative to California Celebrating Women in Public Office Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


California Celebrating Women in Public Office Day.


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-19AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2018-03-19AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15).
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-03-07AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources

Bill Comments