CA ACR189 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Civil Grand Jury Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Grand Jury Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Special Consent ACR189 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - ACR 189 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2018.
2018-04-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-04-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-04-09SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3680.)
2018-04-05SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-22SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-03-22AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4380.)
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-01AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-02-28AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback