CA ACR188 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Colonel Young Oak Kim, United States Army, Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colonel Young Oak Kim, United States Army, Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR188 Quirk-Silva et al. By Nguyen (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - ACR 188 QUIRK-SILVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-05SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5111.)
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-19SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-04-19AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16).
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
2018-04-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-03-01AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-02-28AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback