CA ACR178 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-21)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Irish American Heritage Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Irish American Heritage Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - Senate - Special Consent ACR178 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2018.
2018-04-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-04-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-04-09SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3680.)
2018-04-05SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-19SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Page 4263.)
2018-03-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12).
2018-02-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-02-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback