CA ACR176 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to cruising.
Title
Cruising.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Assembly - ACR 176 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR176 Luz Rivas et al. By Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR176 Luz Rivas et al. By Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4905.) |
2022-08-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |